Multiplication Tricks for 2 and 3 digit numbers

multiplication tricks

Multiplication tricks for 2 and 3 digit numbers:

Take any 2 digit number. Then multiply the first digit of both the number and write it in the first blank as shown. Then multiply the last digit of both numbers and write them in the last blank. Multiply the first digit of the 1st number with the last digit of the 2nd number.  Multiply 2nd digit of the 1st number with 1st digit of the 2nd number and add them up. Write it in the second blank. Then add them up to obtain the result.

MULTIPLICATION TRICKS FOR 2 DIGIT NUMBER:

multiplication tricks

43 x 63

We first multiply 3 x 3 =9 and note down 9. Then cross multiply (4 x 3)= 12 and (6 x 3)= 18. Add both the results (4 x 3 + 6 x 3)= 30. Then write down 0 to the left of 9 and carry 3. After that multiply, the left-hand side numbers (4 x 6)= 24 and add carry 3 (24+3)= 27. Then write it to the left of 0. Finally, the result is 2709.

87 x 33-

We multiply 7 x 3 =21 and note down 1 and carry 2. Then cross multiply (8 x 3)= 24 and  (3 x 7)= 21 and then add both the results with carry 2 (24 + 21 + 2)= 47. Then write down 7 to the left of 1 and carry 4. After that multiply left-hand side numbers (8 x 3) = 24 and then add carry 4 (24+4)= 28 and write it down to the left of 7. Hence, the result is 2871.

MULTIPLICATION TRICKS FOR THREE AND TWO DIGIT NUMBER:

329 x 49

We multiply 9 x 9 =81 and note down 1 and carry 8. Then cross multiply (4 x 9) = 36 and (9 x 2)= 18 and add the results with carry 8  (36 + 18 + 8)= 62. Then write down 2 to the left of 1 and then carry 6. After that cross multiply and add carry 6 (3 x 9 + 4 x 2 + 6) = 41 and note down 1 and carry 4. Now multiply left-hand side numbers and then add carry 4 (3 x 4 + 4) = 16 and write it down to the left of 1. Hence, the result is 16121.

495 x 28

We multiply 5 x 8 =40 and note down 0 and carry 4. Then cross multiply (9 x 8) = 72 and (5 x 2) = 10 and add both the results with carry 4 (72 + 10 + 4)= 86. Then write down 6 to the left of 0 and carry 8.  After that again cross multiply and add carry 8 (4 x 8 + 9 x 2 + 8) = 58 and note down 8 and carry 5. Now multiply the left-hand side numbers and then add carry 5 (4 x 2 + 5) = 13 and then write it down to the left of 8. Finally, the result is 13860.

MULTIPLICATION TRICKS FOR THREE DIGIT NUMBER:

275 x 354

We multiply 5 x 4 =20 and note down 0 and carry 2. Then cross multiply (5 x 5) = 25 and (7 x 4) = 28 and add both the results with carry 2 (25 + 28 + 2) = 55. Then write down 5 to the left of 0 and carry 5.  After that cross multiply and add carry 5 (2 x 4 + 7 x 5 + 5 x 3 + 5) = 63 and note down 3 and carry 6. Then again cross multiply and add carry 6 (2 x 5 + 7 x 3 + 6)= 37 and note down 7 and carry 3.Now multiply the left hand side numbers and then add carry 3 (3 x 2 + 3)= 9 and then write it down to the left of 3. Finally, the result is 97350.

395 x 284

We multiply 5 x 4 =20 and note down 0 and carry 2. Then cross multiply (5 x 8) = 40 and (9 x 4)= 36 and add both the results with carry 2 (40 + 36 + 2)= 78. Then write down 8 to the left of 0 and carry 7. After that cross multiply again and add carry 7 (3 x 4 + 9 x 8 + 5 x 2 + 7) = 101 and note down 1 and carry 10. Then again cross multiply and then add carry 10 (3 x 8 + 9 x 2 + 10) = 52 and note down 2 and carry 5.Now multiply the left-hand side numbers and then add carry 5 (3 x 2 + 5)= 11 and then write it down to the left of 2 and hence the result we get is 112180.

MULTIPLICATION OF NUMBER BY 9 :

945865 x 9 =

We add 0 to the right end of the number, i.e., 9458650. Then we subtract this number, 9458650–945865 = 8512785 and hence the result is 8512785.

77777 x 9 =

We add 0 to the right end of the number, i.e., 777770. Then we subtract this number, 777770 – 77777 = 699993 and hence the result is 699993.

 

Leave a Comment

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *

Scroll to Top
Share via
Copy link
Powered by Social Snap